Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elliott, Rodney, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stawicki, Anderson &Amp; Sinclair, against Wellnitz, Catherine, Wellnitz, Michael, represented by Carbone Smoke &Amp; Koyama, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFreeland, John D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Minute Order
Date: January 12, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: October 01, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 17, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 04, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 09, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 13, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 06, 2017Request for Dismissal - Partial
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional
Date: October 15, 2018Request for Dismissal - Not Entered
Date: December 31, 2018Court's Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 15, 2019Answer
Date: March 03, 2017Civil Complaint
Date: December 21, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 07, 2017Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: June 28, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 01, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 07, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss Minute Order Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Partial | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Not Entered | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.