Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Meda, Francisco, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hinton, Alicia L, Esq., against Hudson Insurance Group, Maadarani, Zyad Ali, Mace Motors, Westlake Financial Investment Services Llc, Westlake Financial Service Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Fallat, John L, Esq., Sodhi Law Group, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Silveira, Marie Sovey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilveira, Marie Sovey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Conditional
Date: April 20, 2018Assignment of Judgment
Date: March 17, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: April 11, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 02, 2021Motion to Reconsider
Date: February 22, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 24, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: June 05, 2018Opposition
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: June 19, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 19, 2018Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: April 05, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 05, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe
Date: December 01, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 17, 2017Statement of Venue
Date: November 04, 2016Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: December 01, 2016Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2017Answer
Date: May 15, 2017Answer
Date: February 17, 2017Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: June 05, 2018Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: February 21, 2017Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe
Date: April 03, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 15, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 17, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 05, 2018Opposition to Motion
Date: July 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 03, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2018Notice
Date: October 30, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 19, 2018Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: October 12, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 27, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: December 17, 2018Reply to Opposition
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Non- Appearance and Non-Opposition
Date: April 21, 2021Motion: Other Post-Disposition
Date: May 04, 2021Opposition
Date: June 20, 2018Reply to Opposition
Date: December 10, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 21, 2017Reply to Opposition
Date: July 19, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: November 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion FOR AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT FOR REPAYMENT Motion: Other Post-Disposition Judge: Mayne, John R |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Non- Appearance and Non-Opposition | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion FOR AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT FOR REPAYMENT Notice of Motion |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF JOHN L FALLAT Declaration |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.