Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited (Legacy) case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Legacy) |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 09/16/2024 at 01:30 PM in Hall of Justice at Department 40
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)] Generated by: Court | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed by: Rebentisch, Ann (Plaintiff) | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Order scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion at 11/16/2023 8:35 AM Court Order in Department 40
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance Filed by: Court | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Motion to Substitute Plaintiff by Plaintiff Ann Rebentisch Co...) of 06/01/2023 Filed by: Clerk | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Motion to Substitute Plaintiff by Plaintiff Ann Rebentisch Co...) | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Substitute Philip Rebentisch in Place of Deceased Plaintiff, Ann Rebentisch Filed by: Rebentisch, Ann (Plaintiff) | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Beauchamp Family LLC; Beauchamp Family 2 LLC on 01/06/2023. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.