Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Civil Limited (Legacy) case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Limited (Legacy) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: scheduled for 01/11/2024 at 08:35 AM in at Department 41 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/08/2024
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to the entire subcase of Complaint filed by UMPQUA BANK on 10/13/2022 | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order for Conditional Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to CCP 664.6 with Court Retaining Jurisdiction: Status Date changed from 12/27/2023 to 01/08/2024 Status changed from Received to Filed | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation RE Conditional Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice Pursuant to CCP 664.6 with Court Retaining Jurisdiction Filed by: Umpqua Bank (Plaintiff) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection Generated by: Court As to: Umpqua Bank (Plaintiff) | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause RE Failure to File Dismissal Filed by: Umpqua Bank (Plaintiff) | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Imposition of Monetary Sanctions or Dismissal scheduled for 01/11/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 41
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection Generated by: Court As to: Umpqua Bank (Plaintiff) | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dis...) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed by: Umpqua Bank (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.