Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited (Legacy) case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Legacy) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Order scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/15/2023 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Filed by: Jenkins, Thomas (Plaintiff) | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to the entire subcase of Complaint filed by THOMAS JENKINS on 10/18/2022 | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Agent Luis C Quirarte; Served Ariana Doe, co occupant of Agent) filed by Jenkins, Thomas on 11/10/2022. | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Ariana Doe, co occupant) filed by Jenkins, Thomas on 11/10/2022. | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Quirarte, Luis Carlos added as a Defendant effective 10/20/2022. | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jenkins, Thomas on 10/18/2022. | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Jenkins, Thomas on 10/18/2022. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.