Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited (Legacy) case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Legacy) |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Conference (Final) scheduled for 08/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 20 | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (10 days) scheduled for 11/12/2025 at 10:00 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 20 | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Regarding March 27, 2024 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Documents Filed by: Uribe, Salvador Jr (Plaintiff); Uribe, Jessica (Plaintiff) | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Jury Trial and Final Trial Setting Conference Filed by: Uribe, Salvador Jr (Plaintiff); Uribe, Jessica (Plaintiff) | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for...) | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Set One Filed by: Uribe, Salvador Jr (Plaintiff); Uribe, Jessica (Plaintiff) | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of Vanessa Van Dao in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel FCA US LLC Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Set One Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents Set One Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Separate Statement in Support of its Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents Set One Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.