Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited (Legacy) case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Legacy) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Service (Substituted Service): Service Cost: 85.00 Cost Waived: No Mailing Date: 10/28/2022 | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Personal Service Statement of Damages: Service Date: 11/01/2022 Service Cost: 85.00 | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service Statement of Damages Filed by: Wright, Felix Ray (Plaintiff) As to: Stay Green Inc (Defendant) Service Date: 11/01/2022 Service Cost: 85.00 | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Substituted Service) Filed by: Wright, Felix Ray (Plaintiff) As to: Gonzalez Gonzalez, Melesio (Defendant) Service Cost: 85.00 Cost Waived: No Mailing Date: 10/28/2022 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed by: Wright, Felix Ray (Plaintiff) | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed by: Stay Green Inc (Defendant); Gonzalez Gonzalez, Melesio (Defendant) | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Order scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court at 11/13/2023 8:35 AM Court Order in Department 41 | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance Generated by: Court | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Harmeling, Karen M added as a effective 01/06/2023. | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Gonzalez Gonzalez, Melesio; Stay Green Inc on 01/06/2023. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.