Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Account And Report Second And Final Account And Report And Final Distribution case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2023 |
CategoryAccount And Report Second And Final Account And Report And Final Distribution |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Probate Notes 202200569036PRWT: In The Matter of Norman C Hammer 03/14/2024 in Department J6 Account and Report Second and Final Account and Report and F...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
|
January 25, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Probate Notes 202200569036PRWT: In The Matter of Norman C Hammer 01/25/2024 in Department J6 Petition For Order Approving First Account , Status Report o...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
|
November 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Probate Notes 202200569036PRWT: In The Matter of Norman C Hammer 11/30/2023 in Department J6 Hearing on Petition Petition for Order Authorizing Prelimina...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.