Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Genalin Y. Riley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (Ventura): Result: Returned and Filed Result Date: 02/01/2022 | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ - Return ( ) Gray Duffy, LLP (Plaintiff) As to: Wm. L. Morris - Fillmore (Defendant) Possession: No | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Ventura) Issued by: Court As to: Wm. L. Morris - Fillmore (Defendant) County: Ventura | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (Ventura): County: Ventura As To Parties: Wm. L. Morris - Fillmore (Defendant) | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection (Writ of Execution received on 07/12/2021.) Generated by: Court As to: Gray Duffy, LLP (Plaintiff) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection (Writ of Execution received on 07/02/2021.) Generated by: Court As to: Gray Duffy, LLP (Plaintiff) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection (Writ of Execution received on 07/02/2021.): As To Parties: Gray Duffy, LLP (Plaintiff) | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) Filed by: Court | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Trial) of 05/03/2021 Filed by: Clerk | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Gray Duffy, LLP on 02/08/2021, Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Morris, Lori |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.