Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bernal, Angelica, David Bernal, Dorothy Bernal, George Reed Inc, filed a(n) Auto Tort: Unlimited case represented by Mccormick Barstow Sheppard, against California Department Of Transportation, City Of Modesto, County Of Stanislaus, George Reed Construction, George Reed Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Arata Swingle Van Egmond &Amp; Heitlinger Aplc, Brunn &Amp; Flynn, California Department Of Transportation, Farrar, Dan, Esq., Hartsuyker, Stratman &Amp; Williams-Abrego, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeauchesne, Roger M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Time To Trial1540 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time723 days |
Settlement Conference
Date: September 20, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: February 20, 2020Ruling
Date: July 22, 2019Objection
Date: July 03, 2019Reply to Opposition
Date: July 03, 2019Objection
Date: June 25, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 25, 2019Opposition to Motion
Date: June 25, 2019Declaration
Date: April 18, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: June 21, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 18, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: April 18, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 01, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 16, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 20, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 16, 2018Order: Good Faith Settlement
Date: August 02, 2018Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: May 18, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 03, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 01, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 27, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 11, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 08, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 05, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 14, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 11, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 16, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 15, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 10, 2017Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: January 26, 2017Summons on Cross-Complaint
Date: December 20, 2016Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: December 16, 2016Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: December 20, 2016Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause
Date: December 15, 2016Answer
Date: December 09, 2016Answer to Cross Complaint
Date: December 05, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 30, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 28, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 23, 2016Demurrer
Date: November 09, 2016Opposition
Date: October 27, 2016Answer
Date: October 24, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 07, 2016Law and Motion Filed
Date: October 07, 2016Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: October 06, 2016Answer
Date: September 06, 2016Civil Complaint
Date: August 09, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Jury Trial Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Hearing |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Settlement Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER Case Management Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Ordered/Referred to Settlement Conference | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Jury Trial Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER - Case Management Conference Settlement Conference Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reserved Hearing
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reserved Hearing
Judge: Sandhu, Sonny S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.