Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gordon Braker Plumbing Contractors Inc, Mobile Plaza Mobilehome Park, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Hart &Amp; King, against Foglia, Marianne, Davis, John, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMayhew, William A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2019 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Evidence Destroyed | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Chain of Possession | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Disposition of ExhibitsReturn of Evidence Order for Disposition of Exhibits/Return of Evidence |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Evidence Received | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.