Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection (Proof of Service of Summons received on 01/20/2021) Generated by: Court | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Rejection (Proof of Service of Summons received on 01/20/2021): As To Parties: removed | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Small Claims Trial) | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jose Godinez on 11/16/2020, Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire Subcase: (Plaintiff's Claim filed by Jose Godinez on 11/16/2020) | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Filed by: Corp, A Calif. Corp. (Defendant); Struct | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge Filed by: Court | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection (Proof of Service of Summons -Received 1/19/21) Generated by: Court As to: Godinez, Jose (Plaintiff) | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Case Status Review scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 08:15 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 22
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Filed by: Godinez, Jose (Plaintiff) As to: Lunden, Gregory Thomas (Defendant); Struct-Corp, A Calif. Corp. (Defendant) | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Genalin Riley in Department 22 Hall of Justice
Judge: Anthony J. Sabo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.