Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jones, Melissa, Jones, Patrick, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Demas Law Group Pc, against Phoenix Building Inc, Thompson, Michael Robert, represented by Law Office Of Matthew G. Salazar, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Freeland, John D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Conference Statement
Date: October 31, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 03, 2016Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 21, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: May 08, 2018Civil Complaint
Date: July 14, 2016Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: April 18, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional
Date: February 15, 2019Answer
Date: August 31, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Order Court's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Order Settlement Conference Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Order Settlement Conference Judge: Freeland, John D |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Order Settlement Conference Statement |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Pleading Document | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.