Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited (Legacy) case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Legacy) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
OSC - Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2023
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to the entire subcase of Complaint filed by OMNINET CV WESTLAKE LLC, et al. on 12/18/2020 | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Filed by: Omninet CV Westlake LLC (Plaintiff); Omninet PF Westlake LLC (Plaintiff); Omninet Oakwood Westlake LLC (Plaintiff) et al. | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
OSC - Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:15 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 22B
Judge: Kevin G. DeNoce |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Civil) Generated by: Court | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Joan Klein - Professional Educational Therapist) filed by Omninet CV Westlake LLC; Omninet Fresno Westlake LLC; Omninet Oakwood Westlake LLC; Omninet PF Westlake LLC on 04/12/2021. | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by Omninet CV Westlake LLC; Omninet Fresno Westlake LLC; Omninet Oakwood Westlake LLC; Omninet PF Westlake LLC on 04/12/2021. | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Klein and Associates Educational Therapists and Consultants Inc on Complaint. | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 20.
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Omninet CV Westlake LLC; Omninet PF Westlake LLC; Omninet Oakwood Westlake LLC; Omninet Fresno Westlake LLC on 12/18/2020. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.