Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2023 |
CategoryHearing On Petition For Termination Of Conservatorship Due To Change In Circumstances Of Conservatee |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Probate Notes 202000544029PRLP: In the Matter of Alison Leigh Suchand 02/06/2024 in Department J6 Hearing on Petition For Termination of Conservatorship ...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
|
December 05, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Probate Notes 202000544029PRLP: In the Matter of Alison Leigh Suchand 12/05/2023 in Department J6 Hearing on Petition For Termination of Conservatorship ...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
|
November 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Probate Notes 202000544029PRLP: In the Matter of Alison Leigh Suchand 11/28/2023 in Department J6 Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report Due 10/18/23 ...
Judge: Roger L. Lund |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.