Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cowell, Debin, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Brownstein Thomas Llp, Gorog, Stephen J, Esq., against Salida Union School District, represented by Mccormick Barstow Sheppard Wayte &Amp; Carruth, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryPremises Liability: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Government Fee Exemption | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.