Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wal Group Llc, Wen, Xiaochuan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Edward C Ip &Amp; Associates, against Huang, Kefeng, Wbv International Limited, Wbv International Llc, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalter, Timothy W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Judgment
Date: August 23, 2016Statement of Damages
Date: December 28, 2015Civil Complaint
Date: December 28, 2015Summary of Case
Date: May 13, 2016Request for Court Judgment
Date: May 13, 2016Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: May 13, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Exemplification - Certificate of Authentication | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment with Proof of Service | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - DefaultProve up Hearing Default/Prove up Hearing |
|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Denied |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.