Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mijangos, Mariscotti, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Daneshrad Law, against Gallagher, Dorise Ann, Lynch, Robert, represented by Ford, Walker Haggerty - Behar, Karim, Shahin, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Mayhew, William A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: November 21, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 21, 2016Civil Complaint
Date: December 04, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 21, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 04, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 02, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 01, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 26, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: July 12, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 11, 2016Answer
Date: April 11, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 24, 2016Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 08, 2016Summons on Cross-Complaint
Date: January 07, 2016Stipulation
Date: January 07, 2016Answer
Date: January 07, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Consolidated | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion & Motion TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS Notice of Motion & Motion |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Statement |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Fiscal Fees Paid Form | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Fees Mediation/Sanctions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.