Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Maria Casey, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited (02) case against Foothill-Deanza Community College District, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Christopher G. Rudy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G. Rudy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2015 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited (02) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Notice of Appeal - No Fee
Date: December 02, 2016Declaration: In Support
Date: June 30, 2016Response/Reply
Date: July 13, 2016Opposition/Objections
Date: July 13, 2016Order
Date: September 13, 2016Notice: Appeal
Date: November 03, 2016Remittitur
Date: February 21, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: June 30, 2016Declaration: In Support
Date: June 30, 2016Declaration: In Support
Date: May 26, 2016Declaration: In Support
Date: June 30, 2016Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 26, 2016Opposition/Objections
Date: June 30, 2016Motion: Other
Date: May 26, 2016Minute Order
Date: September 13, 2016Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2016Petition: Writ of Mandamus
Date: April 09, 2015Request: Judicial Notice
Date: June 30, 2016Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 24, 2015Declaration: In Support
Date: May 26, 2016Appeal: Notice of Estimate of Costs
Date: November 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Remittitur (H044240) Judgment is affirmed |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Record/Exhibits H044240 - From Carmen Plaza De Jennings. |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Record/Exhibits H043243 - From District Court of Appeals. |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Record/Exhibits H044240 - From John McBride. |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate H044240 |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Completion H044240 |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Other $200.00 payment via check for Notice of Estimated Costs |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Notice of Estimate of Costs APPELLANT - $200.00 RESPONDENT - $0.00 |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal - No Fee Exempt from Fees |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Designation clerk's 8.122 reporter's 8.130 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.