Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Keith Marinace, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Bruce Marinace, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2015 |
CategoryEnforcement Of Judgment Unlimited (20) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2015 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 9 |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request: Action Text = Plaintiff's request for a refund of the first paper fee Denied by Judge Arand Legacy Name = CV Request for Action/Ord Decision = D Closed = 05/05/2015 |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Pro per Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/26/2015 |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Text = AMENDED. Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2015 |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2015 |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2015 |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.