Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Josefina Ramos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rodriguez, Robert D, Esq., against Brown, Arthur Ponce, Ponce, Arthur Brown, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management131 days |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time2004 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court's Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Salter, Timothy W |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Not Entered | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.