Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vatche Cabayan Medical Corporation, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2014 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2014 | Hearing | Hearing: Petition | |
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Text = W/POS Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 08/01/2014 |
|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Text = regarding petitioner Vatche Cabayan Medical Corp verified petition to enforce money judgment against property of the Amaral Family Trust.... Legacy Name = PR Ord:Other ... Decision = G Closed = 07/31/2014 |
|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 08/01/2014 |
|
June 26, 2014 | Hearing | Hearing: Petition | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Text = Granting Money Judgment Legacy Name = PR Ord:Other ... Decision = G Closed = 06/26/2014 |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2014 |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2014 |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = verified petition to enforce money judgment Legacy Name = PR Ntc of.... Decision = M Closed = 05/05/2014 |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 05/05/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.