Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sutter'S Place, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against City Of San Jose, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited (37) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1775 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is filed by Sutter's Place, Inc. dba Bay 101 against the City of San Jose and Does 1 through 100. Sutter's Place is seeking declaratory and injunctive relief to require the City to provide annual accountings of its use of table permit ...
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Date: November 27, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: September 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 05, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: January 18, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: January 18, 2019Motion: Protective Order
Date: September 27, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: June 26, 2018Order
Date: May 10, 2019Order
Date: January 24, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: January 24, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: August 01, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 31, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: September 27, 2018Separate Statement
Date: August 01, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2015Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 12, 2017Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: September 27, 2018Separate Statement
Date: August 31, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: October 18, 2018Jury Trial: Long Cause
Date: March 04, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: September 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 04, 2016Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 21, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 01, 2016Minute Order
Date: October 28, 2014Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 14, 2014Minute Order
Date: July 28, 2015Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 06, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 30, 2014Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 28, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2015Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 01, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 20, 2015Minute Order
Date: August 16, 2016Minute Order
Date: April 21, 2015Motion: Compel
Date: August 31, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2015Motion: In Limine
Date: January 18, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: November 27, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: August 19, 2020Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: November 27, 2018Stipulation
Date: November 27, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: November 26, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 28, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Statement
Date: November 21, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: November 27, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2018Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: November 06, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: November 27, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 04, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 13, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: November 21, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: September 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2017Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 02, 2016Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 23, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 29, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 27, 2016Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 31, 2016Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 22, 2016Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte
Date: March 14, 2017Brief: Trial
Date: November 21, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 28, 2016Order: Proposed
Date: October 04, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 23, 2017Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 04, 2015Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 10, 2015Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 17, 2016Declaration: In Support
Date: August 31, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: October 04, 2018Response/Reply
Date: October 11, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: October 19, 2018Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: November 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2015Response/Reply
Date: September 19, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2016Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 09, 2016Minute Order
Date: February 10, 2016Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 20, 2014Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: August 01, 2018Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: July 25, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: November 27, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 01, 2018Conference: Settlement
Date: November 14, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: June 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: September 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 19, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: October 23, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: January 18, 2019Motion: In Limine
Date: January 18, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: September 27, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 25, 2019Brief: Trial
Date: November 21, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 11, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: August 01, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: November 27, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: July 28, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: November 21, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: November 19, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: September 19, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: September 11, 2018Separate Statement
Date: October 04, 2018Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: November 28, 2018Statement
Date: November 21, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: November 21, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: August 01, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: November 27, 2018Motion: In Limine
Date: November 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order **Pending - Sent to Cal 2** re Notice of Conditional Settlement and Request for Stay |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice HRG 7/28/2020 - CSJ's Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 8 |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.