Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Malissa Phok, Kiyoshi Jones, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Aaron Persky presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Name Change
Judge: Department 12 |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document K. Jones, Petition Of |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Decree: Name Change Legacy Name = CV Decree Changing Name Decision = G Closed = 03/25/2014 |
|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit: Proof of Publication Text = San Jose Post Record Legacy Name = CV Proof of Publication Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2014 |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change Text = 3/25/14 SJ Post Record Legacy Name = CV OSC:Name Change Decision = G Closed = 12/30/2013 |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2013 |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition: Name Change Text = $435 pd w/ (2)CLETS Legacy Name = CV Petn:Name Change/fee Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.