Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Clarks Realty Managment Ca, Inc, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2014 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Department 9 |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = filed by Attorney Romas Torres Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2014 |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/02/2014 |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 12/30/2013 |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Text = civil sheet not filed Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 12/24/2013 |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Appeal (Labor Commissioner Award) Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appeal/Labor Commission Award Decision = M Closed = 12/24/2013 |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 12/24/2013 |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.