Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mark David Chen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tracey Ann Chen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Joshua Weinstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Order: Qualified Domestic Relations | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice: Change Address/Firm Name | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration for default filed Disso |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee Judge Pro Tem Kathleen McKenna |
|
June 01, 2016 | Hearing | Conference: Status | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes Non-Criminal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.