Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Abhilash Joseph, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Mips Technologies, Inc., Frederick S Weber, Robin L. Washington, Kenneth H. Traub, Jeffery S. Mccreary, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with James P. Kleinberg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryBusiness Tort/Unfair Bus Prac Unlimited (07) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 1 |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Text = #G-52128 Stip & Order to Dismiss With Prejudice - signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2013 |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Text = G#50562 Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/17/2013 |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order: Deeming Case Complex Text = #G-50440 signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2013 |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Related Cases Text = related case# 112CV237719 EF G50052 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Related Cases Decision = M Closed = 01/04/2013 |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Related Cases Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Related Cases Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2012 |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complex Litigation: Provisional Text = 8, 9 Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2012 |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2012 |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2012 |
|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.