Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Andrei Simel, Brent Elliot, Frank Balma, Ron Hader, Rony Greenberg, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Neoclarus, Inc., represented by Michael G. Ackerman, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with James L. Stoelker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions683 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time803 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ: Attachment (Filed) Text = Santa Clara, issued 7/24/13 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Attach/Returned Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2015 |
|
December 16, 2014 | Hearing |
Attorney Fee Allowance
Judge: Department 13 |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Text = Atty Simon Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Jgmt w/Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2014 |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2014 |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Text = Eric B. Simon Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2014 |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Text = Atty Simon Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2014 |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = For Atty's Fees After Entry of Jgmt 12/16/14 @ 9:00AM D-03 Atty Simon Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2014 |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Text = GRANTED plt's ex parte mtn for entry of judgment upon def Neoclarus, Inc.'s uncured default of installment payments under stip for judgment and settlement agreement. ORDERED 1. Judgment shall be entered in favor of plt's Ron Hader, Brent Elliot, Frank Balma, Andrei Simel, Rony Greenberg, and Yossi Caspi and against def Neoclarus, Inc. in the amount of $165,991.71. 2. Pursuant to Recital 2 of the Settlement Agreement and the Stipulation for Judgment, interest shall accrue on the Judgment at 7% per annum. 3. Pursuant to Paragraph SIX of the Settlement Agreement, Plt's are entitled to recovery of atty's fees. Signed by Judge Elfving. See file for details. Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = G Closed = 09/09/2014 Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) Text = Application for Entry of Judgment (Eric Simon) Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Other Decision = M Closed = 09/09/2014 |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = Judgment GRANTED for plt Ron Hadar, Brent Elliot, Frank Balma, Andrei Simel, Rony Greenberg, and Yossi Caspi and against def Neoclarus, Inc. for a total judgment of $165,991.71. Interest to accrue on Judgment at 7% per annum. Plt's shall recover pre-and-post judgment atty fees upon motion to court. Signed by Judge Elfving. See file for details. Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = G Closed = 09/09/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.