Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kristi Luik, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gino Tessier, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Joshua Weinstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = D Closed = 09/22/2015 |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Kristi Luik and Gino Tessier |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Legal Sep/FC2336 Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Legal Sep/FL2336 Decl Decision = G Closed = 08/21/2012 |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2012 |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2012 |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 08/21/2012 |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = D Closed = 06/07/2012 |
|
April 18, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 82 |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference Text = (p) w/pos Legacy Name = FL Case Management Questionnaire Decision = M Closed = 04/10/2012 |
|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = D Closed = 04/20/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.