Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hsiu-Feng Wang, filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategorySpousal Property Petition |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2012 | Hearing | Petition: Spousal Property | |
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Text = w/ attachment Legacy Name = PR Ord:Spousal Property Decision = G Closed = 04/27/2012 |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition: Probate Other (First) Text = amended Legacy Name = PR Petn:Spousal Property Decision = M Closed = 03/20/2012 |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = amended. 04/17/12-w/proof Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 03/20/2012 |
|
March 16, 2012 | Hearing | Petition: Spousal Property | |
February 15, 2012 | Hearing | Petition: Spousal Property | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = By Mail of Notice of Hearing Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2011 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition: Probate Other (First) Text = $395 pd Legacy Name = PR Petn:Spousal Property Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2011 |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = 2/15/12 Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.