Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Public Guardian, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2011 |
CategoryConservatorship: Person &Amp; Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order: Final Discharge | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Undocumented Action Text = $271.30 paid by Public Guardian for filing fees Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Undocumented Action Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2015 |
|
June 13, 2014 | Hearing | Hearing: Report of Conservator/Executor | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order: Approve Biennial Accounting Text = second account Legacy Name = PR Ord:Approving Ctors Biannual Acct-Gen Decision = G Closed = 06/16/2014 |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Report: Conservator Accounting Biennial Text = for settlement of the 2nd and final account, allowance of compensation - Pd $465.00 Legacy Name = PR Ctor's Acct/Rpt for Biannual Acct-Gen Decision = M Closed = 04/17/2014 |
|
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing: Guardianship/Conservatorship Text = 6-13-14, w/ proof Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg w/POS-Guard/Ctorship Decision = M Closed = 04/17/2014 |
|
September 14, 2012 | Hearing | Hearing: Report of Conservator/Executor | |
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: Approve First Year Accounting Legacy Name = PR Ord:Approving Ctor's 1st Yr Acct-Gen Decision = G Closed = 09/14/2012 |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = COURT INVESTIGATOR'S DECLARATION RE:1st ACCOUNTING Legacy Name = PR Declaration Decision = M Closed = 09/11/2012 |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = CONFIDENTIAL COURT INVESTIGATOR'S DECLARATION RE:1st Accounting Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 09/11/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.