Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Joshua D Witteried, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Melissa Beers, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with JoAnne McCracken presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryOther Family Law Petitions And Complaints |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 30, 2020 | Hearing | Request for Order: TRO | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service served ptr:RFO, temp order, Dec w/exhibits... |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter proof of service needs original signature |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: TRO re: visitation; teco partly granted partly denied w/changes, ost granted, tro date still available |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Application | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Order-Grant | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution: Attorney | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.