Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harry H Yu, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vivian Yu, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sharon A. Chatman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2011 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 71 |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2011 |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = G Closed = 06/03/2011 |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2011 |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Harry H. Yu and Vivian Yu |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2011 |
|
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = FL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 06/03/2011 |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = FL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = D Closed = 04/19/2011 |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = FL Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 04/18/2011 |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.