Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Romelia J Nunez, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rebecca Laapui-Barron, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Beth A. R. McGowen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2017 | Hearing | Request for Order: Domestic Violence | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal DV 200; Clets |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration: Re: Diligence | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
DV Continuance 1st Reiss granted |
|
July 05, 2017 | Hearing | Request for Order: Domestic Violence | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents 04/05/11 to 04/29/11 |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal (p) DV-Clets forms 109, 110, 100, FM-1013, etc) served on Rsp. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.