Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Fahimeh Adelkhani, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time2541 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ: Execution (Filed) | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ: Execution (Filed) | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Unsatisfied, Los Angeles, Issued 2/13/2014 Judge: Mark H. Pierce |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = Sacramento County; $43,726.49 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2015 |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = Costs $220.00 Interest $9,350.86 date of mailing 2/18/15 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2015 |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = Los Angeles $40,192.87 total judgment Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 02/13/2014 |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = costs: $160.00 interest: $5877.24 mail: 02/06/14 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 02/13/2014 |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = costs: $160.00 / credit: $156.00 / interest: $4441.25 / date of mailing: 9/11/13 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2013 |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = sacramento; $38600.88 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2013 |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Jgmt w/Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 08/15/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.