Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Park Victoria Investment Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Gary W. Sullivan, against Jung Ja Lee, Dong Soo Lee, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial Unlawful Detainer Unlimited (31) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions10 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time59 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/27/2011 |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default Text = $56740.75 total judgment per judge manoukian Legacy Name = CV Default Jgmt Decision = G Closed = 06/21/2011 |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Park Victoria Investment Company vs D. Lee, et al |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 585 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 06/15/2011 |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 06/15/2011 |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Text = Declaration and order GRANTED re: use of copies in lieu of originals, signed Judge Manoukian. Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = G Closed = 06/15/2011 |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2011 |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Text = pj not served Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/09/2011 |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 05/09/2011 |
|
April 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.