Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maria G Villalobos-Sanchez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anthony R. Lopez, against Monique Corinne Pasquinelli, represented by Daniel J. Jungwirth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Kevin E. McKenney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2011 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time224 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2011 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 20 |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Text = dismissal Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 11/15/2011 |
|
November 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Filed by Atty Anthony Lopez Jr. Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 11/09/2011 |
|
November 03, 2011 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 20 |
|
September 20, 2011 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 20 |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = Atty. Castillo Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 08/18/2011 |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = Atty Jungwirth Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 06/29/2011 |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = Atty jungwirth Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 06/29/2011 |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/07/2011 |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.