Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Metal & Iron, Inc filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 28, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions580 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time789 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Entire X-Complaint (Atty Michael Smith) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2013 |
|
March 08, 2013 | Hearing | Reserved | |
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 02/20/2013 |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = to complaint with prejudice; and to cross-complaint filed by Collateral Risk Management agst pltf/x-deft U.S. Bank ONLY. (Christopher Chang, pltf's atty; Jennifer Supman, atty for deft/x-complainant) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 02/21/2013 |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Text = Request for dismissal- Atty of record does not match Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 02/14/2013 |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 01/30/2013 |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS Text = re; Def Collateral Risk Management Inc.'s 1-8-13 motion for summary judgment - DENIED by Judge Lucas Legacy Name = CV Ord After Hearing Decision = D Closed = 01/28/2013 |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Text = re (Atty M. Smith) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2013 |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Text = To File Third Amended Cross-Complaint is Granted by Judge Lucas. Legacy Name = CV Stip & Order/$20 fee Decision = G Closed = 01/16/2013 |
|
January 08, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Judge: Department 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.