Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Reginald Morris, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Troung Nguyen, Hang Truong, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Kevin E. McKenney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2011 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time295 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 20 |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Atty Steven Brady Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 01/06/2012 |
|
December 22, 2011 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 20 |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = Unconditional atty Brady Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 12/21/2011 |
|
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = Atty Kerr Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2011 |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty brady Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 11/22/2011 |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 10/04/2011 |
|
September 20, 2011 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 20 |
|
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 09/07/2011 |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty Pham Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 09/06/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.