Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Dean Puccini, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2011 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1664 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction Legacy Name = CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full Decision = M Closed = 09/23/2015 |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: Determination of Claim of Exemption Text = re; 9-11-12 claim of exemption - The judgment debtor's claim of exemption is DENIED. The levying officer is directed to release any earnings held to the judgment creditor for payment of the judgment - signed by Judge Kirwan Legacy Name = CV Ord:Determine Claim of Exempt Decision = M Closed = 09/18/2012 |
|
September 11, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing: Claim of Exemption
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 31, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing: Claim of Exemption
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Opposition to Claim of Exemption Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Oppos to Claim of Exemption Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2012 |
|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Hearing on Claim of Exemption Text = 7-31-12 9am dept.8 Charles Glauberman Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Hrg on Claim of Exemption Decision = M Closed = 07/05/2012 Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = l.a; $32346.55 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2011 |
|
July 19, 2011 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2011 |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Citibank (South Dakota) N.A. vs D. Puccini |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.