Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Billy H. Mccollough, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Derek Woodhouse presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDerek Woodhouse Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2011 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time144 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2011 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 4 |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = (michael s. hunt) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2011 |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/18/2011 |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = atty Singh Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2011 |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2011 |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.