Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Elizabeth A. Bleier, against Amalek E Elyassnia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions138 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/21/2012 |
|
June 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Discover Bank vs A. Elyassnia |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default Text = Total Judgment: $50,922.87 -- signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Default Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012 |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Text = accepting copies in lieu of originals -- signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012 |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of copies in lieu of originals Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 05/16/2012 |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 585 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 05/16/2012 |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Text = court Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 05/16/2012 |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Waiver: Attorney Fees Legacy Name = CV Waiver of Atty Fees Decision = M Closed = 05/16/2012 |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 1033 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 05/16/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.