Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lillian Schmidt, William C Schmidt, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Kevin E. McKenney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin E. McKenney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time159 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 06/06/2012 |
|
June 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 20 |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Removal to Federal Court Text = atty bailey (FF# 495026232) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Removal to Federal Ct Decision = M Closed = 04/20/2012 |
|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Text = re: (Atty M. Yesk) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2012 |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of Michael Yesk re ntc of pltfs' ex parte appl for issuance of osc re preliminary injunction. Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 01/09/2012 |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: Ex Parte Text = Denying ex parte appl for issuance of OSC re preliminary injunction; no factual showing by Judge McKenney. Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Order Decision = D Closed = 01/09/2012 |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) Text = by pltfs for issuance of OSC re preliminary and premanent injunction; and for TRO (Michael Yesk) Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl Decision = M Closed = 01/09/2012 |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2011 |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2011 |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.