Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Debra Giordano, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited (02) case against Michael Ogaz, The City Of Milpitas, Thomas C Williams, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Lucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited (02) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Text = Petn is granted and is entitled to atty fees and costs. Granted the writ is conditioned upon payment by PTRof all expenses associated with complying with her CPRA request. See file for details. Judge Kirwan Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = G Closed = 02/07/2012 |
|
February 07, 2012 | Hearing | Hearing: Petition | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Text = to evidence in support of opp to PTR's Petn date: 02-07-12 time: 9:00am dept: 2 Legacy Name = CV Objection... Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2012 Judge: Patricia M. Lucas |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2012 |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2012 |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Text = in support of petn Legacy Name = CV Reply Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2012 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Text = of respondents to petitioner's points & authorities in support of petn for declaratory relief and writ of mandate to compel production of public records. (J. Leah Castella) Legacy Name = CV Opposition Decision = M Closed = 01/26/2012 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of Jose Esteves in support of City's Opposition to petitioners P's & A's Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 01/27/2012 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of Bronwen Lacey in support of respondents' opposition to petitioner's points & authorities in support of petn for declaratory relief. Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 01/26/2012 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of Carmen Valdez in support of respondents' opposition to petitioner's points & authorities in support of petn for declaratory relief. Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 01/26/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.