Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David Katra, John W Duggan, Susan Katra, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = by mail Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 06/21/2012 |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Text = granting instructions and approving modification of trust terms Legacy Name = PR Ord:Other ... Decision = G Closed = 05/24/2012 |
|
May 23, 2012 | Hearing | Hearing: Petition | |
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 04/18/2012 |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust Text = 05/23/12-- Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg-Decedent's Estate or Trust Decision = M Closed = 04/12/2012 |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = petn for instructions, order approving modification of trust. $395 pd Legacy Name = PR Petn:Other Subsequent w/Fee Decision = M Closed = 04/12/2012 |
|
March 23, 2011 | Hearing | Reserved | |
January 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Text = accepting trustee resignation; declination of trustee..w/proof Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2010 |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Text = w/service. Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2010 |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Consent Text = by beneficiary to appointment, waiver of bond & ntc Legacy Name = PR Consent Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.