Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Zale A Mitchner, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Aileen Mitchner, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2010 |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 09/02/2010 |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 08/02/2010 |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2010 |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2010 |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Appearance Stipulation & Waiver Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2010 |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Disclosure Legacy Name = FL Decl:Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2010 |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2010 |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Zale A. Mitchner and Aileen Mitchner |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 07/14/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.