Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Salko Duranovic, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryConservatorship: Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2013 | Hearing | Letters Biennial Review Report | |
June 27, 2011 | Hearing | Letters Annual Review Report | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Report: Placement Review Legacy Name = PR Placement & Level Care Assess-Ltd Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2010 |
|
June 22, 2010 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Conservator Person | |
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letters: Conservatorship Limited Legacy Name = PR Conservatorship Letters-Limited Decision = M Closed = 06/22/2010 |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order: Compliance Text = Placement & Level Of Care Assessment, By 8/24/10 Legacy Name = PR Ord:Compliance-Conservator Decision = G Closed = 06/22/2010 |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order: Appoint Conservator Person Text = Sean Duranovic - Bond Is Not Required Legacy Name = PR Ord:Appt Conservator/Person-Ltd Decision = G Closed = 06/22/2010 |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
CI Assessment Invoice: Court Investigator Text = Fee waived Legacy Name = PR CI Assessment Invoice Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2010 |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Report: Investigator Conservator Appt Legacy Name = PR CI Rpt:Conserve Appt w/Acct-Ltd Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010 |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = CI'S APPOINTMENT REPORT Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.