Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jada Pogue, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 1980 |
CategoryConservatorship: Person &Amp; Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order: Terminate Conservatorship/Discharge Text = Ctee dcd 5/30/11 Legacy Name = PR Term Ctorship/Deceased Decision = M Closed = 06/01/2012 |
|
March 10, 2011 | Hearing | Hearing: Report of Conservator/Executor | |
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order: Approve First Year Accounting Legacy Name = PR Ord:Approving Ctor's 1st Yr Acct-Gen Decision = G Closed = 03/10/2011 |
|
March 02, 2011 | Hearing | Reserved | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
CI Assessment Invoice: Court Investigator Text = $900 FEE WAIVED DUE TO HARDSHIP Legacy Name = PR CI Assessment Invoice Decision = M Closed = 02/25/2011 |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Determination: Hardship and Investigator Assessment Text = NO FEES ARE CHARGEABLE Legacy Name = PR Determination of Hardship & CI Assess Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2011 |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Report: Investigator-1 year Legacy Name = PR CI Rpt:Ctor 1st Yr Rvw w/Acct-Gen Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2011 |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Report: Confidential Information Text = CONFID ATTACH.RE:HEALTH CARE Legacy Name = PR Confidential Rpt/Info Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2011 |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = CI 1st RVW REPORT W/ACCTG Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2011 |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = CONFID ATTACH. Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.