Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Armando L. Navareete, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Spiro Law Corp., against Tuesday Morning Management Company, Tuesday Morning, Inc., represented by Robert M Dawson, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Pierce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time900 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2012 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 9 |
|
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = with Prejudice as to the Complaint-filed by Attorney Dennis F. Moss *This closes the case* Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012 |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Text = Of firm name & associating Atty Moss Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 04/12/2012 |
|
March 12, 2012 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 9 |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion: In Limine Text = To exclude expert testimony of Dr.David Lewin Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2012 |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Judicial Notice Text = first Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2012 |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request: Judicial Notice Text = second Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2012 |
|
March 07, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Department 9 |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Text = (Ari E. Moss) Legacy Name = CV Statement:Settlement Conf Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2012 |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Text = Case # 109 cv 157826 and 109 cv 160616 will be consolidated for trial and will begin on 3-12-12 in dept 9, signed by Judge Mark Pierce. Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = G Closed = 02/15/2012 Judge: Alfonso Fernandez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.