Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hyo Yoon "Jeff" Kwon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by George G. Benetatos, against Chang Dae Kim, Green Earth Foods, Kim Farms, Kyo-Po Housewares, Kyo-Po Market Of Santa Clara, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Thomas A. Salciccia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1121 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Minute Order
Date: September 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Change of Address |
|
March 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 7 |
|
January 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 7 |
|
June 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 2 |
|
December 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 2 |
|
July 10, 2014 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 2 |
|
January 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Text = re: New address: Law Offices of George G. Benetatos 235 Montgomery St. # 600, San Francisco, Ca 94104 Telephone 1 (415) 203-2296 Fax: 1(415)986-4001 (Atty G. Benetatos) Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 10/15/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.